CT HB05210 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) mandate insurance coverage of essential health benefits, (2) expand mandated health benefits for women, children and adolescents, and (3) expand mandated contraception benefits.
Title
An Act Mandating Insurance Coverage Of Essential Health Benefits And Expanding Mandated Health Benefits For Women, Children And Adolescents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 57 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 57 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Public Act 18-10 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-04-27 | House | File Number 651 |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 438 |
2018-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-25 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4279 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4243 |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 146 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |