CT HB05208 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) redefine mammogram, and (2) eliminate copayments and deductibles for certain breast ultrasounds.
Title
An Act Concerning Mammograms, Breast Ultrasounds And Magnetic Resonance Imaging Of Breasts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Public Act 18-159 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 516 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4900 |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 60 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 74 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |