CT HB05191 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend post-sale warranty work reimbursements that are afforded to the automobile industry to power equipment dealers.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Post-sale Warranty Work Reimbursement For Power Equipment Dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Special Act 18-27 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 553 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5583 |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 172 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 131 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |