CT HB05182 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require building officials in certain municipalities to establish and asses a fee for the commencement of certain work without a necessary permit.
Title
An Act Concerning The Assessment Of Certain Fees By Building Officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 448 |
2018-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 170 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 129 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |