CT HB05180 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require documentation of the name of the individual or entity that poured a concrete foundation at a new residential or commercial building and the date upon which the foundation was poured prior to the issuance of a certificate of occupancy.
Title
An Act Concerning Concrete Foundations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 327 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 327 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 16-45 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | File Number 768 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 552 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5560 |
2016-04-26 | House | File Number 733 |
2016-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-26 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 483 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 304 |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |