CT HB05178 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require school buses to be equipped with three-point lap and shoulder seat safety belts and to require passengers of a school bus to wear seat safety belts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Three-point Lap And Shoulder Seat Safety Belts For School Buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation
2017-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2017-03-01HouseVote to Draft
2017-01-26HousePublic Hearing 01/30
2017-01-23HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-04HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback