CT HB05175 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that purple painted property borders serve as a warning to trespassers.
Title
An Act Concerning Purple Property Borders As Warning To Trespassers.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Jaime Foster [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | File Number 25 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 49 |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |