CT HB05175 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - File Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - File Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enhance oversight and transparency of local and regional board of education budgets.
Title
An Act Concerning Local Board Of Education Budgets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | File Number 455 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 292 |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |