CT HB05170 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit a school employee from taking custody of or searching a student's mobile electronic device except in certain circumstances.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group To Study And Make Recommendations Concerning Issues Relating To The Search And Seizure Of Students' Personal Electronic Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Special Act 18-28 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 554 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5620 |
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 308 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 203 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |