CT HB05163 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) prohibit deficiency judgments on mortgage loans where the property secured by the mortgage has a crumbling concrete foundation, (2) prohibit mortgage lenders and mortgage correspondent lenders from denying an application for a residential mortgage loan based solely on certain prior defaults, conveyances or foreclosures by the applicant, and (3) prohibit mortgage lenders and mortgage correspondent lenders from reporting to credit rating agencies that mortgage loans secured by property with a crumbling concrete foundation are subject to a deficiency judgment.
Title
An Act Concerning Deficiency Judgments And Residential Properties With A Concrete Foundation Affected By Pyrrhotite.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 240 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 158 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2019-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |