CT HB05157 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal certain provisions pertaining to the State-Assisted Housing Sustainability Fund.
Title
An Act Repealing Provisions Concerning The State-assisted Housing Sustainability Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3793 |
2024-03-18 | House | File Number 41 |
2024-03-18 | House | House Calendar Number 59 |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |