CT HB05155 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Department of Developmental Services regarding waiver of licensing fees for private providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Tax Imposed On Ambulatory Surgical Centers And Annual Adjustments To Assessment Rates Adopted For Certain Units Of Common Interest Communities And Condominiums Under Common Ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 343 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-30SenatePublic Act 18-170
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateRules Suspended
2018-05-09SenateSenate Calendar Number 567
2018-05-09SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-09HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5982
2018-03-28HouseFile Number 54
2018-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 68
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-09HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-23HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback