CT HB05144 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 629
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 629
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for the removal of debris from the Housatonic River in the area of the town of Stratford.
Title
An Act Concerning The Removal Of Debris From The Housatonic River Near The Town Of Stratford.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] |
Rep. Philip Young [D] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | File Number 629 |
2022-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 34 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 73 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |