CT HB05137 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 227
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 227
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study modifications to the Roberta B. Willis Scholarship program and appropriate funds to the program.
Title
An Act Studying And Funding The Roberta B. Willis Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Emmanuel Sanchez [D] | Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D] | Rep. Laura Devlin [R] | Rep. Kate Farrar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 227 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 190 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |