CT HB05137 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To bar a home improvement subcontractor from placing a mechanic's lien on a residential homeowner's property for failure of the contractor to pay the subcontractor when the homeowner has paid the contractor or is disputing the contractor's compliance with a home improvement contract.
Title
An Act Concerning Home Improvement Subcontractor Liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | File Number 99 | |
2010-03-23 | House Calendar Number 70 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |