CT HB05136 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit retired public safety personnel to receive retirement allowances, but not credit in to a municipal pension system, if such personnel are employed by a local or regional board of education in a public safety capacity after retirement.
Title
An Act Concerning The Continuation Of Retirement Allowances For Certain Retirees Upon Subsequent Employment By A Board Of Education.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Liz Linehan [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] |
Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |