CT HB05134 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - File Number 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - File Number 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that owners of real property taken for use for school construction purposes shall be compensated the greater of the average value of two independent appraisals or the assessed value of such property according to the most recent grand list.
Title
An Act Concerning The Acquisition Of Real Property To Be Used For School Construction.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Rep. Selim Noujaim [R] | Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D] |
Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | File Number 669 |
2014-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-19 | House | File Number 42 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 39 |
2014-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |