CT HB05126 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - File Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - File Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To move towards implementing the Interstate National Compact regarding a national popular vote for the election of the President, rather than the electoral college system.
Title
An Act Concerning An Agreement Among The States To Elect The President Of The United States By National Popular Vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | File Number 134 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 83 |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |