CT HB05124 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require landlords to notify prospective and current tenants of foreclosure proceedings and to permit tenants to seek court appointment of a receiver upon receiving such notice.
Title
An Act Requiring Landlords To Notify Tenants Of Foreclosure Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |