CT HB05124 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - File Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - File Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the preservation of records of historical value and to lift restrictions on access to government and medical records after a certain amount of time has passed.
Title
An Act Concerning The Preservation Of Historical Records And Access To Restricted Records In The State Archives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | File Number 400 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 234 |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |