CT HB05117 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To strengthen the penalties available when the operator of a motor vehicle fails to immediately stop when directed to do so by a school crossing guard.
Title
An Act Concerning Increased Penalties For Failing To Stop For School Crossing Guards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-17 | House | Public Act 13-22 |
2013-05-14 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-03 | House | File Number 699 |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 507 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6308 |
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 618 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 408 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-24 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |