CT HB05113 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-27-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-27-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the number of concussions in children by: (1) Requiring the State Board of Education to develop or approve a concussion education plan, (2) requiring the operators of youth athletic activities to provide information on concussions to youth athletes and their parents and guardians, (3) requiring youth athletes suspected of sustaining a concussion to provide written clearance from a medical professional prior to returning to the athletic activity, (4) limiting full contact practices to ninety minutes per week, and (5) requiring local and regional boards of education to compile and report all instances of concussions suffered by children in school.
Title
An Act Concerning Youth Athletics And Concussions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 344 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 105 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 105 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-12 | House | Public Act 14-66 |
2014-05-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-04-28 | House | File Number 690 |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 490 |
2014-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-04-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4192 |
2014-04-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4151 |
2014-04-17 | House | File Number 622 |
2014-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2014-03-27 | House | File Number 144 |
2014-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 103 |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |