CT HB05106 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority and the Department of Economic and Community Development to jointly finance projects under the Private Rental Investment Mortgage and Equity (PRIME) program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Private Rental Investment Mortgage And Equity Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Berger [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | House Commerce Committee | Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R] |
Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 432 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-161 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | File Number 630 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Calendar Number 482 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4489 | |
2012-04-02 | File Number 206 | |
2012-04-02 | House Calendar Number 174 | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Housing | |
2012-03-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-01 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Housing | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |