CT HB05094 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the issuance of bonds for a water line in the town of Thomaston on Jackson Street.
Title
An Act Concerning The Construction Of A Water Line In The Town Of Thomaston.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2015-01-21 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |