CT HB05087 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the General Law Committee's Real Estate Property Condition Disclosure Report Form Revision Work Group.
Title
An Act Requiring The Commissioner Of Consumer Protection To Make Changes To The Residential Property Condition Disclosure Report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 416 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-122 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-23 | File Number 579 | |
2012-04-23 | Senate Calendar Number 403 | |
2012-04-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-19 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-19 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3420 | |
2012-04-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2012-03-26 | File Number 93 | |
2012-03-26 | House Calendar Number 105 | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |