CT HB05055 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - File Number 272
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - File Number 272
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Decreasing Wait Times At The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | File Number 272 |
2016-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 197 |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |