CT HB05052 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - File Number 621
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - File Number 621
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations concerning human services programs.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations For Human Services Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | File Number 621 |
2014-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 391 |
2014-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |