CT HB05047 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 595
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 595
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Recommendations For General Government.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | File Number 595 |
2024-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 408 |
2024-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |