CT HB05046 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 635
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Sustainability Of Transportation Projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseFile Number 635
2018-04-23HouseHouse Calendar Number 415
2018-04-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-16HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM
2018-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-05HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback