CT HB05044 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 167
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 167
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Fair Treatment Of Sick Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 167 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 126 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |