CT HB05044 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 662
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-19HouseFile Number 662
2016-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 417
2016-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM
2016-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-06HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/18
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/16
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/11
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/10
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/09
2016-02-05HousePublic Hearing 02/08
2016-02-04HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback