CT HB05044 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Liability Of Owners And Keepers Of Domesticated Horses, Ponies, Donkeys And Mules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 67 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-05-14HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2014-05-14HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2014-05-09HousePublic Act 14-54
2014-05-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2014-05-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-21HouseFile Number 642
2014-04-21HouseSenate Calendar Number 435
2014-04-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-17HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-17HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3548
2014-03-19HouseFile Number 39
2014-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 36
2014-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2014-02-24HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2014-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback