CT HB05043 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - File Number 654
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Promoting A Fair, Civil And Harassment-free Workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HouseFile Number 654
2018-04-30HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-30HouseNew File by Committee on Appropriations
2018-04-30HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/18 10:00 AM
2018-04-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-17HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2018-04-04HouseFile Number 166
2018-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 125
2018-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback