CT HB05034 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Deficiency Appropriations For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseFile Number 490
2018-04-16HouseHouse Calendar Number 333
2018-04-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
2018-04-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-05HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-07HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback