CT HB05032 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to the higher education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Higher Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Aldarondo [D] | House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-156 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-20 | File Number 562 | |
2012-04-18 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-18 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3348 | |
2012-04-04 | File Number 247 | |
2012-04-04 | House Calendar Number 200 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |