CT HB05032 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require individual and group health insurance policies to provide coverage for bone marrow testing.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Bone Marrow Testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 444 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-20 | Public Act 11-88 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-20 | File Number 821 | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Calendar Number 530 | |
2011-05-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-18 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-18 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5981 | |
2011-05-05 | File Number 758 | |
2011-05-05 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-05 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-16 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-08 | File Number 40 | |
2011-03-08 | House Calendar Number 46 | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-02-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-01-31 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |