CT HB05028 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to analyze the administrative costs of collecting state taxes and make recommendations for the elimination of any state tax for which the administrative costs for collection are greater than the revenue such tax generates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Child Care Licensing, Certain Municipal Pension Deficit Funding Bonds, Reciprocal Licensing Of Itinerant Food Vending Establishments, Functions Of The Department Of Rehabilitation Services, Business Deductions And Taxation Of Certain Wages And Income, Oral Health Assessments Requested By Local Or Regional Boards Of Education, Property Tax Treatment Of Certain Converted Condominium And Common Interest Community Units, And Payment Of Certain Grants, Advances And Transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-30SenatePublic Act 18-169
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateRules Suspended
2018-05-09SenateSenate Calendar Number 561
2018-05-09SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-09HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5910
2018-04-17HouseFile Number 528
2018-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 354
2018-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-05HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-04-02HouseDrafted by Committee
2018-03-23HouseVote to Draft
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2018-02-21HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback