CT HB05021 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Competitive Alcoholic Liquor Pricing And Hours Of Operation For Permittees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 PASS AS AMENDED BY HOUSE A (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 AS AMENDED (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 AS AMENDED (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-08 | Public Act 12-17 | |
2012-05-01 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-01 | Rules Suspended | |
2012-04-27 | File Number 595 | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Calendar Number 434 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-26 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-26 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3976 | |
2012-04-17 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-04-03 | File Number 226 | |
2012-04-03 | House Calendar Number 194 | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |