CT HB05019 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Public Hearing 03/11
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Public Hearing 03/11
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage consumer use of reusable bags.
Title
An Act Establishing A Five-cent Tax On Single-use Plastic And Paper Bags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |