CO SR004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of September 27 as "First Responder Appreciation Day" in Colorado.
Title
First Responder Appreciation Day
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Garcia [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |