CO SJR050 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Notify Governor of Adjournment
Title
Notify Governor of Adjournment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-12 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D400909F23F05CD287257718005D7C98?Open |