CO SJR039 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Pike National Historic Trail
Title
Pike National Historic Trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0E8E329A6FCA2EFC87257847007B6754?Open |