CO SJR035 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Violence Hospital Med Care Professionals
Title
Violence Hospital Med Care Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 10-035 to the full Senate for further action (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-12 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |