CO SJR033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
Summary
Designating CO Hwy 67 POW/MIA Memorial Highway
Title
Designating CO Hwy 67 POW/MIA Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/2D6017C751EF48C687257B36006E023A?Open |