CO SJR025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Convening Date for the 2022 Second Regular Session of the Seventy-third General Assembly.
Title
2022 Convening Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |