CO SJR018 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-29)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-29)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning designation of State Highway 78 in Pueblo County as the "PFC Thomas Michael Hanratty Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate PFC Thomas Michael Hanratty Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |