CO SJR017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
National Agriculture Day
Title
National Agriculture Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/89A5DAE430D6E5B6872576D6007D53AE?Open |