CO SJR016 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Summary
GA Amicus Participation In Federal TABOR Lawsuit
Title
GA Amicus Participation In Federal TABOR Lawsuit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AE5A0857CA39AEBD87257B13005E5BF3?Open |