CO SB296 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning financing public schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Financing Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.045 (Attachment G). (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.046 (Attachment I). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.053 (Attachment F). (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.054 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.050 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.055 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.046 (Attachment I). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.053 (Attachment F). (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.054 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.050 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.055 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |