CO SB288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the decoupling of the compensation of a member of the general assembly from the compensation of a county court judge.
Title
Decouple GA Compensation From Judges' Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. David Young [D] | Rep. KC Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 17-288 indefinitely. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-288 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |